This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 09:51:07 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. Aruba Networks LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Aruba Networks LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04912

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

XR Communications, LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendant

ARUBA NETWORKS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W Conkle

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James N Pickens

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION. The Court orders as follows: LA CV 21-04912-DOC (JDEx) shall be consolidated with SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 17-00596-DOC (JDEx). Case LA CV 21-04912-DOC (JDEx) is hereby administratively closed. No further filings shall be filed in this case. Any party / counsel not listed on the low numbered case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV17-596 DOC(JDEx), (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00596 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge John F. Walter to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04912 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. Amended Notice Of Related Cases Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-596; 8:17-cv-00674; 2:17-cv- 02945; 2:17-cv- 02948; 2:17-cv-02951; 2:17-cv- 02953; 2:17-cv-02959; 2:17-cv- 02968; 8:21-cv-01063; 2:21-cv-04914; 2:21-cv-04942; 8:21-cv- 01065 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Aruba Networks LLC. (iv) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Aruba Networks LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481241 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party XR Communications, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARUBA NETWORKS INC. is a litigant