This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 10:12:08 (UTC).

XR Communications LLC v. Arris Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 XR Communications LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arris Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00621

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies

XR Communications LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendant

Arris Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Alice E. Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matthew S. Yungwirth

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gilbert Andrew Greene

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

900 S. Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite 300

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #41

Exhibit AO

12 #40

Exhibit AN

12 #38

Exhibit AL

12 #34

Exhibit AH

12 #32

Exhibit AF

12 #30

Exhibit AD

12 #28

Exhibit AB

12 #26

Exhibit Z

12 #17

Exhibit Q

12 #15

Exhibit O

12 #9

Exhibit I

12 #8

Exhibit H

12 #4

Exhibit D

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

#12

#1

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC, #30 Exhibit AD, #31 Exhibit AE, #32 Exhibit AF, #33 Exhibit AG, #34 Exhibit AH, #35 Exhibit AI, #36 Exhibit AJ, #37 Exhibit AK, #38 Exhibit AL, #39 Exhibit AM, #40 Exhibit AN, #41 Exhibit AO)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alice E. Snedeker for Arris Solutions, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth for Arris Solutions, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Alice E. Snedeker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14977191) by on behalf of Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Matthew S. Yungwirth ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14977165) by on behalf of Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Arris Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Gilbert Andrew Greene added to party Arris Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by XR Communications LLC re #1 Complaint (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arris Solutions, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to James N. Pickens. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14922656), filed by Arris Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRIS Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lin Y. Chan