XR Communications LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 9/7/2021; Amazon.com Services LLC answer due 9/7/2021; eero LLC answer due 9/7/2021. (ir) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC and eero LLCs (Amazon or Defendants) unopposed motion to extend the time within which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement (Complaint). In light of this motion, the Court is of the opinion that the motion is meritorious and it should be, and is hereby, granted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants unopposed motion to extend the time within which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the time in which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint be extended to and include September 7, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, eero LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/4/2021) (bw). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLCand eero LLC answer due 8/13/2021. (lad) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC and eero LLCs (Amazon or Defendants) unopposed motion to extend the time within which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement (Complaint). In light of this motion, the Court is of the opinion thatthe motion is meritorious and it should be, and is hereby, granted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants unopposed motion to extend the time within which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the time in which Defendants are required to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint be extended to and include August 13, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, eero LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, eero LLC. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Amazon.Com, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party eero LLC(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XR Communications LLC. eero LLC served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XR Communications LLC. Amazon.com Services LLC served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XR Communications LLC. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by XR Communications LLC re #1 Complaint (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by XR Communications LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by XR Communications LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to eero LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to James N. Pickens. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14922632), filed by XR Communications LLC d/b/a Vivato Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less