This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 11:08:18 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. Ruckus Wireless, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ruckus Wireless, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04679

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba VIVATO TECHNOLOGIES,

XR Communications, LLC doing business as Vivato Technologies

Defendants and Counter Claimants

RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC.,

Ruckus Wireless, Inc.

Counter Defendant

XR Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Nathan Pickens

Attorney at James N. Pickens Esq.

1104 Nw 88Th Way

Plantation, FL 33322

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Y. Chan

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alice Egan Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Meghan Charlene Killian

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

Spear Tower One Market Plaza Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105-1127

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3448

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ruckus Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CommScope Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent ARRIS US Holdings, Inc. for Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

22 #39

Exhibit AM

22 #36

Exhibit AJ

22 #30

Exhibit AD

22 #23

Exhibit W

22 #17

Exhibit Q

22 #16

Exhibit P

22 #4

Exhibit D

22 #2

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba VIVATO TECHNOLOGIES, re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba VIVATO TECHNOLOGIES, re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ruckus Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CommScope Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent ARRIS US Holdings, Inc. for Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against XR Communications, LLC byRuckus Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC, #30 Exhibit AD, #31 Exhibit AE, #32 Exhibit AF, #33 Exhibit AG, #34 Exhibit AH, #35 Exhibit AI, #36 Exhibit AJ, #37 Exhibit AK, #38 Exhibit AL, #39 Exhibit AM, #40 Exhibit AN, #41 Exhibit AO, #42 Declaration of Matt Yungwirth)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 7/19/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by XR Communications, LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ruckus Wireless, Inc... (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Ruckus Wireless, Inc. re #11 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent - Ruckus's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 7/7/2021) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Alice E. Snedeker ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16139843.) filed by Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Snedeker, Alice) (Filed on 7/2/2021) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Yungwirth ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16139112.) filed by Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Yungwirth, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2021) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Charlene Killian (Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 7/1/2021) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ruckus Wireless, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba VIVATO TECHNOLOGIES, re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC., ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16089390.). Filed byXR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba VIVATO TECHNOLOGIES,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle