This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 08:55:43 (UTC).

Xochimitl et al v. Clipper Equity LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Xochimitl filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Clipper Equity LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Cheryl L. Pollak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06748

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francisco Xochimitl

Edwin J. Cruz

Teofilo Reyes

Defendants

Clipper Equity LLC

Bistricer Holdings LLC

4611 Associates LLC

3100 Ocean LLC

David Bistricer

Gabriel Bistricer

J.J. Bistricer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Hans Cooper

Attorney at Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC

200 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold, LLP

600 Third Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Adam Kahan Brody

Attorney at Mintz & Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Carli M Aberle

Attorney at Mintz & Gold LLP

600 Third Ave, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 3100 Ocean LLC, 4611 Associates LLC, David Bistricer, Gabriel Bistricer, J.J. Bistricer, Bistricer Holdings LLC, Clipper Equity LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teofilo Reyes, Edwin J. Cruz, Francisco Xochimitl. All Defendants. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carli M Aberle on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Aberle, Carli) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kahan Brody on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Brody, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER re #8 : Granting Referral to Mediation. Selection of Mediator due by 2/17/2022. The defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 30 days after the conclusion of mediation. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/3/2022. (Henney, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Motion to Request Mediation , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by 3100 Ocean LLC, 4611 Associates LLC, David Bistricer, Gabriel Bistricer, J.J. Bistricer, Bistricer Holdings LLC, Clipper Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kahan Brody on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Brody, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carli M Aberle on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Aberle, Carli) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teofilo Reyes, Edwin J. Cruz, Francisco Xochimitl. All Defendants. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to 3100 Ocean LLC, 4611 Associates LLC, David Bistricer, Gabriel Bistricer, J.J. Bistricer, Bistricer Holdings LLC, Clipper Equity LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 3100 Ocean LLC, 4611 Associates LLC, David Bistricer, Gabriel Bistricer, J.J. Bistricer, Bistricer Holdings LLC, Clipper Equity LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15089216 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Teofilo Reyes, Edwin J. Cruz, Francisco Xochimitl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Dean Pollack