This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:35:19 (UTC).

XMission v. Strategic Task Management et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 XMission filed an Other lawsuit against Strategic Task Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce S. Jenkins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce S. Jenkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XMission

Defendants

Alliance Ventures

Chris Armstrong

Offer Space

Darin Toone

Peterson Elite Enterprises

Combustion Media

Justin Johnson

Slick Rock Ventures

Traffic Space

Strategic Task Management

Christopher Peterson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan K. Cameron

Attorney at DENTONS DURHAM JONES & PINEGAR PC

3301 N Thanksgiving Wy Ste 400

Lehi, UT 84043

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. As per Notice of Dismissal no. 15. (kpf) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff XMission (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by XMission (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Peterson Elite Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Combustion Media. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alliance Ventures. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Slick Rock Ventures. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Offer Space. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Traffic Space. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Peterson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Justin Johnson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Darin Toone. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chris Armstrong. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Strategic Task Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3764987) filed by XMission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Plaintiff XMission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XMission is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan K. Cameron