This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2020 at 16:04:52 (UTC).

XMission v. Flex Marketing Group

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 XMission filed an Other lawsuit against Flex Marketing Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XMission

Defendant

Flex Marketing Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan K. Cameron

Attorney at DURHAM JONES & PINEGAR, P.C.

3301 N Thanksgiving Wy Ste 400

Lehi, UT 84043

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #6 . (alf) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff XMission (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by XMission as to Flex Marketing Group Waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/29/2020. (nl) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Flex Marketing Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Flex Marketing Group (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3558484) filed by XMission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Cameron, Jordan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff XMission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XMission is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan K. Cameron