This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2020 at 11:51:45 (UTC).

XL Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Z Marine LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 XL Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Z Marine LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr, Robert H. Walker and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00213

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judges

Robert H. Walker

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

XL Catlin

Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Scott W. Gurney

Defendants

Sierra International LLC

Seastar Solutions

Sierra International, Inc.

Marine Acquisition Corp.

Z Marine LLC

Med Art Marine

Domestic Group AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Catherine S. Spann

Attorney at HAND ARENDALL, LLC - Mobile

11 North Water Street, Rsa Tower, Suite 30200, P. O. Box 123 (36601)

Mobile, AL 36602

Defendant Attorneys

Jon Stephen Kennedy

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP - Ridgeland

1400 Meadowbrook Road, Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39211

Charles B. Wynn, Jr.

Attorney at MCANGUS, GOUDELOCK & COURIE, LLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 2955, 1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 706 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158

Robert P. Thompson

Attorney at MCANGUS, GOUDELOCK & COURIE, LLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 2955, 1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 706 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #14. Counsel should use the correct Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:20cv213LG-RPM. (wld) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Marine Acquisition Corp., Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc..(Kennedy, Jon) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wynn, Jr on behalf of Med Art Marine (Wynn, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Med Art Marine.(Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5,6,7,8,9,10 and 11. A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (wld) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Med Art Marine answer due 8/24/2020. (wld) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Response due August 24, 2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 08/05/2020. (smb) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Seastar Solutions served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Sierra International LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Sierra International, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Marine Acquisition Corp. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Domestic Group AB served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Z Marine LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. Med Art Marine served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Spann, Catherine) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Med Art Marine (Thompson, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketParties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RPM on future filings. (PKS) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/20 (PKS) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketIssued summons mailed to attorney to address listed on docket/summons. (JCH) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Domestic Group AB, Marine Acquisition Corp., Med Art Marine, Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc., Z Marine LLC. (JCH) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Domestic Group AB, Marine Acquisition Corp., Med Art Marine, Seastar Solutions, Sierra International LLC, Sierra International, Inc., Z Marine LLC (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4308406), filed by XL Catlin, Scott W. Gurney, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Deer Dynasty Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Serra International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Thompson