This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 08:58:41 (UTC).

Xitumul Soto et al v. The Village in Times Square LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Xitumul Soto filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Village in Times Square LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05463

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto

Defendants

Artemio Cielo

The Village in Times Square LLC doing business as Joe's Pizza

Giovanni Carollo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Antonio Faillace

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 4510

New York, NY 10165

Kevin Scott Johnson

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street, Ste 4510

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Scott Johnson on behalf of Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Village in Times Square LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Giovanni Carollo..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Artemio Cielo..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Artemio Cielo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Giovanni Carollo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Village in Times Square LLC (d/b/a Joe's Pizza), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Giovanni Carollo, Artemio Cielo, The Village in Times Square LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20713665)Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Scott Johnson on behalf of Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Village in Times Square LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Giovanni Carollo..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Artemio Cielo..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Artemio Cielo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Giovanni Carollo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Village in Times Square LLC (d/b/a Joe's Pizza), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Giovanni Carollo, Artemio Cielo, The Village in Times Square LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20713665)Document filed by Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(individually), Jose Manuel Xitumul Soto(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less