This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2020 at 09:20:45 (UTC).

Xiong, Brian v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Xiong, Brian filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Brian V. Xiong

Defendant

Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas E. Fairweather

Attorney at Hawks Quindel, S.C.

409 East Main Street, Po Box 2155

Madison, WI 53701-2155

Defendant Attorneys

Anne Maryse Bensky

Attorney at Wisconsin Dept of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Rachel Lee Bachhuber

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, Po Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bachhuber, Rachel) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 4/22/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. Waiver sent 4/9/2020, not 4/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (voc) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2647185.), filed by Brian V. Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fairweather, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (Bachhuber, Rachel) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 4/22/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. Waiver sent 4/9/2020, not 4/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. (voc) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2647185.), filed by Brian V. Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fairweather, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less