This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:03:47 (UTC).

Xie et al v. Lai et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Xie filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Lai. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-MC-80287

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tonggui Xie

Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,

Inspire Group Development Corporation

Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation

Defendants

Terry Lai

1016138 B.C.

Crystal Yang

Sun & S Contracting Ltd.,

Ng Kam Hai

Terry Kin Keong Lai

BH Koh Soong Zarin & Partners

Julie Cheah Yut Sum

Soo Kin Teh

0999334 B.C. Ltd.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin Thomas Jackson

Attorney at Structure Law Group, LLP

Suite 135, 1754 Technology Drive, 1754 Technology Drive

San Jose, CA 95110

Mark Figueiredo

Attorney at Structure Law Group, LLP

1754 Technology Drive, Suite 135

San Jose, CA 95110

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM in Support of Application for order filed by Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation, Tonggui Xie. (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

receipt

#3

(#3) Declaration of Sampson Pun filed byCanphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation, Tonggui Xie re #5 Order (Jackson, Austin) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Order by BH Koh Soong Zarin & Partners, Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/20/2019. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Declaration of Tonggui Xie filed byCanphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation, Tonggui Xie re #5 Order (Jackson, Austin) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #1 Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/20/2019. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Order by BH Koh Soong Zarin & Partners, Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Sampson Pun filed byCanphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Tonggui Xie filed byCanphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM in Support of Application for order filed by Canphoenix Enterprises Ltd.,, Inspire Group Development Corporation, Inspire Group Trites Project Corporation, Tonggui Xie. (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less