This case was last updated from PACER on 02/06/2021 at 11:26:57 (UTC).

Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd. v. Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul C. Huck and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-25010

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul C. Huck

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.

Defendant

Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC

2335 Nw 107 Ave., Freezone Showroom, 2M44 Mailbox #30

Doral, FL 33172

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Scott Rapacke

Attorney at The Rapacke Law Group, P.A.

1840 N. Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33322

Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu

Attorney at Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC

David Silver

Attorney at Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC

Defendant Attorneys

Hartwell P. Morse, III

Attorney at Nuby Law

3030 Aurora Avenue

Monroe, LA 71201

Garrett Ari Barten

Attorney at Christopher & Weisberg, P.A.

1232 N. University Drive

Plantation, FL 33322

Elissa Ann Tisdahl

Attorney at Christopher & Weisberg, P.A.

1232 N. University Drive

Plantation, FL 33322

Robert M. Chiaviello, Jr.

Attorney at Nuby Law

3030 Aurora Avenue

Monroe, LA 71201

 

Court Documents

33 #1

Exhibit Potential Witnesss Table

#33

(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Potential Witnesss Table)(Barten, Garrett) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

32 #1

Exhibit 1

#32

(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#31

(#31) RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/5/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

25 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Abraham J. Hakim

#25

(#25) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Abraham J. Hakim)(Barten, Garrett) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

23 #1

Exhibit Hakim Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer

#23

(#31) RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/5/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#6

(#8) PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Silver. It is ORDERED that David Silver, may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd.; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at david@bayramoglu-legal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#7) PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu. It is Ordered that Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at deniz@bayramoglulegal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jbs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (jbs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-2

#1

(#25) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Abraham J. Hakim)(Barten, Garrett) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Potential Witnesss Table)(Barten, Garrett) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/5/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER HOLDING THE COURTS RULING ON #29 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING IN ABEYANCE. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Defendant's MOTION for Claim Construction Hearing by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Tisdahl, Elissa) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on 1/15/2021 before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, 1-18 pages, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5634 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2021. (ilz) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER staying #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Re: #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Response due by 2/4/2021 Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER HOLDING THE COURT'S RULING;Staying #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Abraham J. Hakim)(Barten, Garrett) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#24) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: and MINUTE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/15/2021, Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2021. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Elissa Ann Tisdahl, Robert M. Chiaviello, Jr, Hartwell P. Morse, III, Garrett Ari Barten, Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu, David Silver, Andrew Scott Rapacke. Defendant SHALL file a Motion for Claim Construction Hearing (10-page maximum) on or before Friday, January 22, 2021. Plaintiff SHALL file a Response to the Motion for Claim Construction Hearing on or before Friday, January 29, 2021. Defendant SHALL file a Reply on or before Wednesday, February 3, 2021. Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5634 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (as02) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Attorney Elissa Ann Tisdahl added to party Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Tisdahl, Elissa) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Silver. It is ORDERED that David Silver, may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd.; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at david@bayramoglu-legal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu. It is Ordered that Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at deniz@bayramoglulegal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Silver. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14008613 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14008603 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jbs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (jbs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14000375, filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Rapacke, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrett Ari Barten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elissa Ann Tisdahl(Designation Retained)