This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 08:07:46 (UTC).

Xia v. United Airlines

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Xia filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against United Airlines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ying xia

Defendant

United Airlines Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Russell Roberts

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Richard T Stilwell

Attorney at Stilwell Law Firm PLLC

3131 Eastside Street, Ste. 444

Houston, TX 77098

Amanda Roberts Pierson

Attorney at Stilwell Law Firm PLLC

3131 Eastside St, Ste 440

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/14/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order

#6

(#6) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United Airlines Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order)(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ying Xia, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines Inc, filed.(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by United Airlines Inc, filed.(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

2 #1

Supplement

1 #7

Exhibit United's Certificate of Fact from TX SOS

1 #6

Exhibit United's Original Answer and Jury Demand

1 #5

Exhibit Service of Process on United

1 #4

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #3

Exhibit Certified Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit List of All Counsel

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-10300 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24276756) filed by United Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit List of All Counsel, #3 Exhibit Certified Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Service of Process on United, #6 Exhibit United's Original Answer and Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit United's Certificate of Fact from TX SOS, #8 Exhibit United's Application for Registration with TX SOS)(Stilwell, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/14/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United Airlines Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order)(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ying Xia, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines Inc, filed.(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by United Airlines Inc, filed.(Pierson, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-10300 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24276756) filed by United Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit List of All Counsel, #3 Exhibit Certified Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Service of Process on United, #6 Exhibit United's Original Answer and Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit United's Certificate of Fact from TX SOS, #8 Exhibit United's Application for Registration with TX SOS)(Stilwell, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin R. Roberts