This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 10:01:57 (UTC).

XHAXHO-SKEZAS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 XHAXHO-SKEZAS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-17619

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL L. KELLY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1638 S. Pacific Coast Highway

Redondo Beach, CA 90277

Defendant Attorneys

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM) against IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, filed by AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS.(KELLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Personal Care Products Council ONLY by AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS. (KELLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Personal Care Products Council ONLY by AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS. (KELLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM) against IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, filed by AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS.(KELLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 9/27/2021, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jal, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12837440) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AIDA XHAXHO-SKEZAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KELLY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER