This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 07:42:15 (UTC).

Xerox Corporation v. Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Xerox Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Colormarketing Graphics Printing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah L. Boardman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01849

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah L. Boardman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xerox Corporation

Defendants

Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC

Glenn Morris

Upper Marlboro, MD 20774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald J Walsh

Attorney at RKW, LLC

4Th Floor, 10075 Red Run Boulevard

Owings Mills, MD 21117

Morgan Thomas Dilks

Attorney at RKW Law Group

10075 Red Run Blvd, Suite 401

Owings Mills, MD 21117

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER re:Conference call. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 9/23/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 9.23.2022) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Xerox Corporation(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Defendant Glenn Morris' Counterclaim by Xerox Corporation.(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Xerox Corporation(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Glenn Morris.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022; Glenn Morris served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022.(Walsh, Donald) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Glenn Morris.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

4 #1

Summons to Glenn Morris

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

2 #1

Attachment

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re:Conference call. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 9/23/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 9.23.2022) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Xerox Corporation(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Defendant Glenn Morris' Counterclaim by Xerox Corporation.(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Xerox Corporation(Dilks, Morgan) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Glenn Morris.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022; Glenn Morris served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022.(Walsh, Donald) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Glenn Morris.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Xerox Corporation re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons to Glenn Morris)(Walsh, Donald) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Capitol Office Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Imaging Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate CDR Associates LLC, Other Affiliate Buck Consultants, LLC, Other Affiliate ComDoc, Inc., Other Affiliate Restaurant Technology Services LLC, Other Affiliate Arizona Office Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Berney Office solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate N&L Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Carolina Office Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Carr Business Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Chicago Office Technology Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Connecticut Business Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate Xerox Business Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Education Services Company, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS@Xerox LLC, Other Affiliate American Photocopy Equipment Company of Pittsburgh, LLC, Other Affiliate Aquamer Medical Corp., Other Affiliate Conway Office Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Business Equipment Unlimited, Other Affiliate Cameron Office Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Eastern Managed Print Network, LLC, Other Affiliate Northeast Copier Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate CopyCo Office Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate CTX Business Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Dahill Office Technology Corporation, Other Affiliate Denitech Corporation, Other Affiliate Electronic Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate TML Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate GDP Finance, Inc., Other Affiliate Georgia Duplicating Products, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Iowa, Inc., Other Affiliate Midwest Business Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Premier Office Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate ImageQuest, Inc., Other Affiliate Image Technology Specialists, Inc., Other Affiliate Inland Business Machines, Inc., Other Affiliate Precision Copier Service, Inc. d/b/a Sierra Office Solutions, Other Affiliate Lucas Business Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Lewan & Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Imaging Concepts of New Mexico, Inc., Other Affiliate Merizon Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate Michigan Office Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Minnesota Office Technology Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Mr. Copy, Inc., Other Affiliate MRC Smart Technology Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate MWB Copy Products, Inc., Other Affiliate SoCal Office Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Martin Whalen Office Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate MW Leasing Company, Other Affiliate Quality Business Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Boise Office Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate R.K. Dixon Company, Other Affiliate Saxon Business Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Xerox Audio Visual Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Daniel Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Zeno Office Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Zeno Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Zoom Imaging Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate GroupFire, Inc., Other Affiliate Gyricon, LLC, Other Affiliate Infotonics Technology Center, Inc., Other Affiliate institute for Research on Learning, Other Affiliate Intradyn, Inc., Other Affiliate Kushner Locke, LLC, Other Affiliate LaserNetworks, Inc., Other Affiliate Lateral Data, L.P., Other Affiliate NewField Information Technology, LLC, Other Affiliate NewPARC, LLC, Other Affiliate On Demand Books, LLC, Other Affiliate Ontario Midland Railroad Corp., Other Affiliate Opto Generic Devices, Inc., Other Affiliate Pacesetter/MVHC, Inc., Other Affiliate Pacific Services and Development Corporation, Other Affiliate Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated, Other Affiliate PARC China Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate PowerCloud Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Power Assure, Inc., Other Affiliate Sol Focus, Inc., Other Affiliate SCC Burton Corporation, Other Affiliate Stewart Business systems, LLC, Other Affiliate The Xerox Foundation, Other Affiliate ACS Application Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Agilera, LLC, Other Affiliate Agilera Messaging, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS BRC Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS BPO Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Records Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Title Records Corporation, Other Affiliate ACS TMC, Inc., Other Affiliate Digital Information Systems Company, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Xerox Audit & Compliance Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Xerox Government Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate Xerox Heritage, LLC, Other Affiliate Xerox State Healthcare, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS EDI Gateway, Inc., Other Affiliate Consultec IPA, Inc., Other Affiliate Xerox Federal Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Health Care, Inc., Other Affiliate CredenceHealth, Inc., Other Affiliate MidasPlus, Inc., Other Affiliate Statit Software, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS CompIQ Corporation, Other Affiliate Xerox Consultant Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Superior Venture Partner, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Human Resources Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Buck Kwasha Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate LiveWire, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS HR Solutions World Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Image Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS IT Solutions, LP, Other Affiliate ACS Lending, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Business Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS/ECG Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Defense, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Protection Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Securities Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Trust I, Other Affiliate ACS Welfare Benefit Trust, Other Affiliate Breakaway Healthcare and Life Sciences, LLC, Other Affiliate Health Technology Acquisition Company, Other Affiliate Outsourced Administrative Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Intellinex, LLC, Other Affiliate LearnSomething, Inc., Other Affiliate LiveBridge, Inc., Other Affiliate Newspaper Services Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Mercury Fund II, Ltd., Other Affiliate Specialty I, LLC, Other Affiliate the National Abandoned Property Processing Corporation, Other Affiliate Wagers & Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Wireless Data Services North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Wireless Data Services (Operations), Inc., Other Affiliate WDS Global-Texas, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Education Sales and Marketing, LLC, Other Affiliate TMS Health, LLC, Other Affiliate Truckload Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ACS Asset Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Education Loan Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Print and Mail Services, Inc, Other Affiliate ACS Human Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ACS Middle East, Inc., Other Affiliate ParkIndy LLC, Other Affiliate Transaction Processing Specialists, Inc., Other Affiliate Talegen Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FX Global, Inc., Other Affiliate FX Global Supply Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate FX Palo Alto Laboratory, Inc., Other Affiliate XC Asia LLC, Other Affiliate XMPie, Inc., Other Affiliate Nuvisio Corporation for Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Walsh, Donald) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Colormarketing Graphics & Printing LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10070065.), filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Walsh, Donald) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XEROX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Thomas Dilks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald J Walsh