This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:18:25

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Xavier against Myers in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-00788
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge J. Phil Gilbert
  • Courthouse Illinois Southern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Pacheco Xavier
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Dr. Myers
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Order for Service of Process upon Dr. Myers. Wexford H...

Free with Subscription
#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Dr. Myers waiver s...

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Myers on 9/17/20...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Pacheco Xavier...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jsm2) (Entered:...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Procee...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Pacheco Xavier. (j...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pachec...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Dr. Myers waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#12) DOCKET ANNOTATION - Scanning Centralia added this date for receipt of electronic transmissions. (jsm2) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Myers on 9/17/2019. Waiver of Service due by 10/17/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#10) Order for Service of Process upon Dr. Myers. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Wexford from the docket. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2019. (anp) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $99.23 received, receipt number 34625094950 (rah) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Pacheco Xavier. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $99.23. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Centralia Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/30/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/30/2019)
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#6) ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 1/1/2019 to 7/22/2019 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Centralia Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 9/9/2019). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filed in the wrong case. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#5) ENTRY STRICKEN: ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Smith's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's trust fund account balance as of July 6, 2019 was $666.33, which is sufficient to pay the $400.00 filing fee. Plaintiff lists no monthly expenses. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee no later than August 23, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 7/24/2019 (tjk). (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-cv-788-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/22/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Pacheco Xavier. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pacheco Xavier. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pacheco Xavier.(jsm2) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.