This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2022 at 06:20:51 (UTC).

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al v. Timeshare Exit Hotline et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Timeshare Exit Hotline. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J Kelly, David A. Baker and Wendy W. Berger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00674

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judges

Gregory J Kelly

David A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

Wyndham Resort Development Corporation

Defendants

Richard Fonbuena

Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Timeshare Defense Attorneys

Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC a Utah limited liability company doing business as Timeshare Defense Attorneys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Suite 1600, 300 S Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

Christian Leger

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen LLP

Suite 1600, 300 South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

Glennys Ortega Rubin

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Suite 1600, 300 S Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

George Mark Albright

Attorney at Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright

801 S. Rancho Drive, Suite D-4

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Jeffrey Michael Partlow

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

1900 Summit Tower Blvd., Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32810

Robert W. Anthony, Jr.

Attorney at Fassett, Anthony & Taylor, PA

1325 W Colonial Dr

Orlando, FL 32804

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

20 #1

Exhibit A

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against Richard Fonbuena, Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD, Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 9/26/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER that the Notice #17, construed as a motion to amend, is GRANTED. On or before September 28, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file an amended pleading to remove all claims against Defendant Timeshare Exit Hotline a/k/a Airtime Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/21/2022. (RMF) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal, without prejudice of Complaint against Airtime Media, LLC only by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 9/22/2022, to add docket text. (SPB). (Entered: 09/21/2022)

16 #1

Exhibit A

16 #16

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Mag Jdg Celeste F Bremer on 4/8/2022. (MB) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KNC) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#19) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against Richard Fonbuena, Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD, Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 9/26/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of compliance re #18 Order directing compliance, Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With This Court's Order and Notice of Ripeness for Adjudication of Amended Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Fonbuena Defendants Only by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. re #16 AMENDED JOINT MOTION and Stipulation for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Fonbuena Defedants Only Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit to the Parties' Amended Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Order [DE 16} (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against Richard Fonbuena, Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD, Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 9/26/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER that the Notice #17, construed as a motion to amend, is GRANTED. On or before September 28, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file an amended pleading to remove all claims against Defendant Timeshare Exit Hotline a/k/a Airtime Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/21/2022. (RMF) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal, without prejudice of Complaint against Airtime Media, LLC only by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 9/22/2022, to add docket text. (SPB). (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED JOINT MOTION and Stipulation for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Fonbuena Defedants Only #13 Joint NOTICE of Settlement and MOTION and Stipulation for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Order by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Modified on 9/21/2022, to edit docket text. (SPB) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OBJECTION by Timeshare Exit Hotline re #13 Joint NOTICE of Settlement and MOTION and Stipulation for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Order . (Anthony, Robert) Modified on 9/9/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Partlow on behalf of Richard Fonbuena, Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD, Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC (Partlow, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint NOTICE of Settlement and MOTION and Stipulation for Entry of Final Permanent Injunction Order by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 8/4/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 7/13/2022 to edit docket text (KNC). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to counsel G. Mark Albright of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on June 23, 2022 by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation as to Richard Fonbuena, Fonbuena Law Firm, CHTD, Fonbuena Law Firm, PLLC. (Rubin, Glennys) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docket(#8) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:22-cv-674-WWB-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (MLJ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/18/2022. (RMF) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Mag Jdg Celeste F Bremer on 4/8/2022. (MB) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KNC) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0674-WWB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19432192) filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Rubin, Glennys) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyndham Resort Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Michael Partlow