This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:12:37 (UTC).

Wyche et al v. Cellco Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Wyche filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lorna wyche

Bon Appetit Spa, LLC

Alkaline Detox Shop, LLC

Defendants

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Sued Erroneously as "Cellco Partnership"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Patrick James Cleary

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke, LLP

1441 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wake County Superior Court, case number 21CV013204. ( Filing fee $ 402) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Eastern District) (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Eastern District

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of All Defendants. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Bryan M. Sumner & James E. Hairston, Jr. of Hairston Lane, PA at 434 Fayetteville St., Suite 2350, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on November 2, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-450-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-165-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/2/2021. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketIntradistrict Transfer to Western Division. New case number - 5:21-cv-450-D. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-450-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-165-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/2/2021. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Bryan M. Sumner & James E. Hairston, Jr. of Hairston Lane, PA at 434 Fayetteville St., Suite 2350, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on November 2, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Counsel did not specify the parties served, the method of service, or the date of service with this document pursuant to Section VI.B. of the CM/ECF Policies and ProceduresManual. Counsel is directed to file a certificate of service using the event "certificate of service under the service of process". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of All Defendants. (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wake County Superior Court, case number 21CV013204. ( Filing fee $ 402) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Eastern District) (Cleary, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick James Cleary