This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2019 at 07:11:29 (UTC).

Wyatt et al v. Davis H Elliot Company Inc

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Wyatt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Davis H Elliot Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00976

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlene Wyatt

Defendant

Davis H Elliot Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Forrest L P DeVaughn

Attorney at Parrish Devaughn Law Firm

7 S Mickey Mantle Dr, 2Nd Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Larry E Finn

Attorney at Parrish Devaughn Law Firm

7 S Mickey Mantle Dr, 2Nd Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Murry J Parrish

Attorney at Parrish Devaughn Law Firm

7 S Mickey Mantle Dr, 2Nd Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A Paruolo

Attorney at Nelson Terry Morton DeWitt & Paruolo

3540 S Boulevard, Suite 300

Edmond, OK 73013

J Derek Cowan

Attorney at DeWitt Paruolo Meek PLLC

Po Box 138800, 3540 S Boulevard, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit 3-3 Aff of Service State Court

1 #2

Exhibit 2-2 EOA of Finn State Court

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Cowan, J) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Forrest L P DeVaughn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DeVaughn, Forrest) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (md) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Davis H Elliot Company Inc . (Cowan, J) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#9

(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Charlene Wyatt, Charlene Wyatt. (Finn, Larry) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-5431 filed by Davis H Elliot Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 EOA of Finn State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 Aff of Service State Court, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-1 State Court Petition

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Paruolo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Davis H Elliot Company Inc.(Paruolo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Charlene Wyatt(Individually ), Charlene Wyatt(Administrator of the Estate of Dakota Doucet, Deceased) (Finn, Larry) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4-4 State Court Docket Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Charlene Wyatt, Charlene Wyatt. (Finn, Larry) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (md) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Forrest L P DeVaughn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DeVaughn, Forrest) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Charlene Wyatt(Individually ), Charlene Wyatt(Administrator of the Estate of Dakota Doucet, Deceased) (Finn, Larry) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Davis H Elliot Company Inc . (Cowan, J) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Davis H Elliot Company Inc.(Paruolo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Cowan, J) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Davis H Elliot Company Inc (Paruolo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3023159. (Paruolo, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-5431 filed by Davis H Elliot Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 EOA of Finn State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 Aff of Service State Court, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.