This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 08:02:27 (UTC).

Wunsch Farms v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Wunsch Farms filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer Cropscience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00748

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wunsch Farms

Defendants

Corteva, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Univar Solutions, Inc.

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Growmark FS, LLC

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett Cebulash

Attorney at TAUS CEBULASH LLP

80 Maiden Lane, Suite 1204

New York, NY 10038

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel J Nordin

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kevin Landau

Attorney at TAUS CEBULASH LLP

80 Maiden Lane, Suite 1204

New York, NY 10038

Mickey L Stevens

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W. Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL BURKE PA

431 S. Seventh Street, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55415

X. Kevin Zhao

Attorney at GREENE ESPEL PLLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Todd A Wind

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Jon M. Woodruff

Attorney at STINSON LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jaime Stilson

Attorney at DORSEY AND WHITNEY LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Brandon J. Wheeler

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

David L Hashmall

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

Richard G Jensen

Attorney at FABYANSKE AND WESTRA PA

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

James J. Long

Attorney at BRIGGS AND MORGAN

332 Minnesota Street, 2200 First National Bank Building

St. Paul, MN 55101

Jevon Bindman

Attorney at MASLON LLP

90 S. Seventh Street, 3300 Wells Fargo Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#50

49 #1

*Restricted*

#49

#48

#46

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Mary Fee terminated.Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/20/21. (ARL) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00970. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #46 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #46 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #42 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wunsch Farms . (Nordin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-970 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge David S. Doty on 4/14/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett Cebulash. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8691460 filed by Wunsch Farms. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin S. Landau. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8691446 filed by Wunsch Farms. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brett Cebulash, Kevin Landau, Evan Rosin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (MKB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MKB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-970 (DSD/ECW). (MKB) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8677174) filed by Wunsch Farms. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federated Co-operatives Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant