This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:21 (UTC).

Wunderlin v. Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Wunderlin filed an Other lawsuit against Wilshire Commercial Capital L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05488

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kasey Wunderlin

Defendants

Does 1-10

Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at Lemberg Law, L.L.C.

43 Danbury Road

Wilton, CT 06897

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: WHEREAS THE PARTIES entered into a stipulation to set aside the default entered against Defendant WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, LLC. THEREFORE, per the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, this Court orders as follows: IT IS SO ORDERED that the default entered against Defendant is vacated. Defendant has until February 18, 2020 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/24/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re Clerks Entry of Default by Kasey Wunderlin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Kasey Wunderlin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Kasey Wunderlin. Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/10/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kasey Wunderlin. (jap) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. dba Wilshire Consumer Capital. (jap) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kasey Wunderlin (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152837). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: WHEREAS THE PARTIES entered into a stipulation to set aside the default entered against Defendant WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, LLC. THEREFORE, per the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, this Court orders as follows: IT IS SO ORDERED that the default entered against Defendant is vacated. Defendant has until February 18, 2020 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/24/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re Clerks Entry of Default by Kasey Wunderlin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket---VACATED at #8 Order---Clerks Entry of Default as to Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. (tmf) Modified on 1/24/2020 to add redline text(tmf). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Kasey Wunderlin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Kasey Wunderlin. Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/10/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kasey Wunderlin. (jap) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wilshire Commercial Capital L.L.C. dba Wilshire Consumer Capital. (jap) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kasey Wunderlin (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9152837). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.