This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 08:08:56 (UTC).

Wu, D.M.D., M.S. v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Wu, D M D , M S filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05335

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Wu, D.M.D., M.S.

Defendant

Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Cogan Buxbaum Bourhis

Attorney at Bourhis Law Group

1808 Wedemeyer Street, Suite 214

San Francisco, CA 94129

Ray Francis Bourhis

Attorney at Bourhis Law Group

1808 Wedemeyer Street

San Francisco, CA 94129

Ritsa Gountoumas

Attorney at Bourhis Law Group

1808 Wedemeyer Street, Suite 214

San Francisco, CA 94129

Defendant Attorneys

John David Collins

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

Corban James Porter

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1450

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#19

17 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (USDC - Northern District of AL)

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration of Corban J. Porter in Support of Notice of Removal

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGuardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts. gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, October 14, 2021, by 10:00 AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.can d.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.. (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Timothy Wu, D.M.D., M.S... (Bourhis, Matthew) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Filed byTimothy Wu, D.M.D., M.S.. (Gountoumas, Ritsa) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER as Modified by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #10 Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/13/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Timothy Wu, D.M.D., M.S.. (Gountoumas, Ritsa) (Filed on 7/26/2021) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John David Collins. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Hess. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16190158.) filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (USDC - Northern District of AL))(Collins, John) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16190146.) filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America . (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20 from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-file d. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-20-587805. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16170024). Filed byGuardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corban J. Porter in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/13/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corban James Porter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Collins