This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 08:32:18 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. ZTE Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZTE Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant

ZTE Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darcy L. Jones

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Heather S. Kim

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

John W. Downing

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jonathan K. Waldrop

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphine Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Marcus A. Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Paul G. Williams

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2445

Atlanta, GA 30309

ThucMinh Nguyen

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC

8416 Old Mcgregor Rd.

Waco, TX 76712

Defendant Attorney

Lionel M. Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP

1875 Explorer Street, Suite 800

Reston, VA 20190

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER. In view of the pending motion, the Court hereby VACATES all deadlines. The Court will set new deadlines upon resolution of the pending motion.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Defendant ZTE Corporation. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by ZTE Corporation, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service filed by Defendant ZTE Corporation (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

11 #10

Exhibit I - FedEx Confirmation of shipment to ZTE in China

11 #1

Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service by ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

7 #10

I - ZTE Proof of Service (139 Case)

7 #9

H - ZTE Proof of Service (138 Case)

7 #8

G - ZTE Proof of Service (137 Case)

7 #7

F - ZTE Proof of Service (136 Case)

7 #6

E - FedEx confirmation of shipment to ZTE in China

7 #5

D - Email from ZTE's US counsel refusing to accept service

7 #4

C - Email asking ZTE's US counsel to accept service

7 #3

B - Address of ZTE USA's registered agent in Texas

7 #2

A - List of Texas cases against ZTE

7 #1

Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop

#7

(#7) MOTION For Leave To Effect Alternative Service On Defendant by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop, #2 A - List of Texas cases against ZTE, #3 B - Address of ZTE USA's registered agent in Texas, #4 C - Email asking ZTE's US counsel to accept service, #5 D - Email from ZTE's US counsel refusing to accept service, #6 E - FedEx confirmation of shipment to ZTE in China, #7 F - ZTE Proof of Service (136 Case), #8 G - ZTE Proof of Service (137 Case), #9 H - ZTE Proof of Service (138 Case), #10 I - ZTE Proof of Service (139 Case))(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER. In view of the pending motion, the Court hereby VACATES all deadlines. The Court will set new deadlines upon resolution of the pending motion.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Defendant ZTE Corporation. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by ZTE Corporation, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service filed by Defendant ZTE Corporation (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WSOU Investments LLC, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service filed by Defendant ZTE Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop, #2 Exhibit A - List of Texas cases against ZTE, #3 Exhibit B - Address of ZTE USA's registered agent in Texas, #4 Exhibit C - ZTE Corp SEC Registration, #5 Exhibit D - ZTE Corp U.S. Import Records, #6 Exhibit E - Buy ZTE Axon 30 Ultra (US), #7 Exhibit F - Buy ZTE Axon 30 (US), #8 Exhibit G - Email asking ZTE's US counsel to accept service, #9 Exhibit H - Email from ZTE's US counsel refusing to accept service, #10 Exhibit I - FedEx Confirmation of shipment to ZTE in China, #11 Exhibit J - ZTE Proof of Service (136 Case), #12 Exhibit K - ZTE Proof of Service (137 Case), #13 Exhibit L - ZTE Proof of Service (138 Case), #14 Exhibit M - ZTE Proof of Service (139 Case))(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS REPORT / Plaintiff's Case Readiness Status Report by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Heather Kim, #2 Exhibit 1)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WSOU Investments LLC, re #7 MOTION For Leave To Effect Alternative Service On Defendant filed by Plaintiff WSOU Investments LLC / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Defendant (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Service, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim; and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service by ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION For Leave To Effect Alternative Service On Defendant by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Waldrop, #2 A - List of Texas cases against ZTE, #3 B - Address of ZTE USA's registered agent in Texas, #4 C - Email asking ZTE's US counsel to accept service, #5 D - Email from ZTE's US counsel refusing to accept service, #6 E - FedEx confirmation of shipment to ZTE in China, #7 F - ZTE Proof of Service (136 Case), #8 G - ZTE Proof of Service (137 Case), #9 H - ZTE Proof of Service (138 Case), #10 I - ZTE Proof of Service (139 Case))(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments LLC. ZTE Corporation served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to ZTE Corporation. (jc5) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments LLC. on ZTE Corporation c/o ZTE (USA), Inc. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development identifying Corporate Parent WSOU Holdings, LLC for WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15692496), filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US7872973, #2 Exhibit 2-'973 Patent Claim Chart, #3 Exhibit A-ZXR10 5960 series switch, #4 Exhibit B-Importing ZTE Switches in USA, #5 Exhibit C-ZTE NGN Solutions used by Corisat, #6 Exhibit D-ZTE ZXR10 5960 switch product description, #7 Exhibit E-PFC Mechanism, #8 Exhibit F-PFC operation, #9 Exhibit G-PFC Pause Message, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZTE (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant