This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 11:36:28 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Salesforce.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Salesforce com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01163

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant

Salesforce.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Ryan Scott Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group PLLC

2600 E Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Travis Lee Richins

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120 / 324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brett Aaron Mangrum

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Jeffrey Huang

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group PLLC

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Law Firm of Walt Fair, PLLC

1508 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Brian Matthew Koide

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brett Aaron Mangrum added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 12/20/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14302518). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brett Aaron Mangrum added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 12/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14302518). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Siegmund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Matthew Koide