This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 06:49:04 (UTC).

WSOU Investments, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 WSOU Investments, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Netgear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01117

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant

Netgear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Michael Lennon

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue, 19806

Wilmington, DE 19806

Darcy L. Jones

Heather S. Kim

Jack Shaw

John W. Downing

Jonathan K. Waldrop

Marcus A. Barber

Paul G. Williams

Shelley Ivan

ThucMinh Nguyen

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Ying

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amr O. Aly, Yusuf Esat, Lisa M. Schoedel and Mitchell L. Denti - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Netgear, Inc. filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 24, 2021 - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments, LLC. Netgear, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#6

SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Heather S. Kim, ThucMinh Nguyen, Jack Shaw, Paul G. Williams, and Shelley Ivan filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netgear, Inc. on 8/2/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,512,096 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit 2

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed, coordinated order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amr O. Aly, Yusuf Esat, Lisa M. Schoedel and Mitchell L. Denti filed by Netgear, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/24/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amr O. Aly, Yusuf Esat, Lisa M. Schoedel and Mitchell L. Denti - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Netgear, Inc. filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Netgear, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Shelley Ivan for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Heather S. Kim for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jack Shaw for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01120-MN, 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN(srs). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney John W. Downing for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01120-MN, 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN(srs). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Marcus A. Barber, Paul G. Williams, ThucMinh Nguyen for WSOU Investments, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 24, 2021 - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments, LLC. Netgear, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Heather S. Kim, ThucMinh Nguyen, Jack Shaw, Paul G. Williams, and Shelley Ivan filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01117-MN, 1:21-cv-01119-MN, 1:21-cv-01120-MN (rjb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Heather S. Kim, ThucMinh Nguyen, Jack Shaw, Paul G. Williams, and Shelley Ivan - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netgear, Inc. on 8/2/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,512,096 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Netgear, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3669506.) - filed by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Netgear, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Ying