This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 11:48:20 (UTC).

WSOU Investments, LLC v. NetGear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 WSOU Investments, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NetGear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00155

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant

NetGear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John W. Downing

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Law Firm of Walt Fair, PLLC

1508 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Heather S. Kim

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jonathan K. Waldrop

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphine Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Jack Shaw

Attorney at Kawowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Marcus A. Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Darcy L. Jones

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Defendant Attorneys

Amr 0. Aly

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David R. Clonts

Attorney at Cadwell Clonts & Reeder LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Alexander J. Hadjis

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Lisa M. Schoedel

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Yusuf Esat

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Kevin E. Cadwell

Attorney at Cadwell Clonts & Reeder LLP

777 S. Post Oak Lane, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Cayman C. Mitchell

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

919 Third Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Declaration of Karen Wu

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Wu, #2 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Yusuf Esat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14639035) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Amr O. Aly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14638704) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Lisa M. Schoedel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14628025) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on behalf of NetGear, Inc. by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#5

(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Wu, #2 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yusuf Esat for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amr 0. Aly for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa M. Schoedel for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cayman C. Mitchell for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Yusuf Esat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14639035) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Amr O. Aly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14638704) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander J. Hadjis for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R. Clonts on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. Attorney David R. Clonts added to party NetGear, Inc.(pty:dft) (Clonts, David) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Lisa M. Schoedel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14628025) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin E. Cadwell on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell added to party NetGear, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on behalf of NetGear, Inc. by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments, LLC. NetGear, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to NetGear, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14501206), filed by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Netgear, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Shaw