This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:49:10 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-07561

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Juniper Networks Inc

Counter Defendant

WSOU Investments LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Edward J Naughton

One Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Sarah Gabrielle Hartman

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

2211 Michelson Drive, Seventh Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Timothy Joseph Rousseau

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra Carcaterra Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

David M. Stein

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

2211 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Rebecca M. Lecaroz

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

One Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111

Edward J. Naughton

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

1 Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111

Yarelyn Mena

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Dallas Bullard

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Dr., 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94065

Joseph E. Reed

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Joshua Scheufler

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Dr., 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94065

Margaret Shyr

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Fl.

Redwood Shores, CA 94025

Pushkal Mishra

50 Steeplechase

Irvine, CA 92602

Kevin P.B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Todd M. Briggs

B. Russell Horton

Attorney at George, Brothers, Kincaid & Horton, L.L.P.

114 West 7Th Street, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Nima Hefazi

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Todd Michael Briggs

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Fifth Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Joseph Evans Reed

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#115

(#115) REPLY (re #105 MOTION to Dismiss WSOU's Indirect Infringement Claims ) filed byJuniper Networks Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#114

(#114) ORDER GRANTING #109 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2021. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#113

(#113) ORDER GRANTING #110 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2021. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

110 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

110 #110

Main Document

109 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

109 #109

Main Document

105 #1

Proposed Order

105 #105

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

227 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) REPLY (re #105 MOTION to Dismiss WSOU's Indirect Infringement Claims ) filed byJuniper Networks Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER GRANTING #109 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2021. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ORDER GRANTING #110 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2021. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #105 MOTION to Dismiss WSOU's Indirect Infringement Claims ) filed byWSOU Investments LLC. (Hartman, Sarah) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) / Notice of Withdrawal of Raymond W Mort as Counsel for Plaintiff by Sarah Gabrielle Hartman (Hartman, Sarah) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Edward J. Naughton ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16621624.) filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Naughton, Edward) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Rousseau ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16621374.) filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rousseau, Timothy) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING.Motion as to #105 MOTION to Dismiss WSOU's Indirect Infringement Claims Hearing reset to 3/3/2022 09:00 AM and Case Management Conference reset to 3/3/2022 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Todd Michael Briggs Notice of Withdrawal of B Russell Horton as Counsel for Defendant (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Todd Michael Briggs Notice of Withdrawal of Pushkal Mishra as Counsel for Defendant (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13957367) by on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13957361) by on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13957352) by on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13957343) by on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13932883), filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yarelyn Mena