This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:55:34 (UTC).

WSOU Investments, LLC v. Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 WSOU Investments, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arista Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alex G. Tse and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-08679

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Alex G. Tse

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant

Arista Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryce T. Barcelo

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Shawn Blackburn

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Raymond Wright

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste. 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Amit Makker

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Douglas Ethan Lumish

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jeffrey G. Homrig

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Brian W. Lewis

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Linfong Tzeng

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Richard G. Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WSOU Investments LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#67

(#67) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/26/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2021) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

66 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

66 #66

Main Document

#64

(#64) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by WSOU Investments LLC.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#63

(#63) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arista Networks, Inc... (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#62

(#62) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/22/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#61

(#61) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

60 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9,2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet: Attorney Information

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WSOU Investments LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/26/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2021) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/26/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2021) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#65) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by WSOU Investments LLC.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arista Networks, Inc... (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/22/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-01083. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTACHMENT corrected signature page to #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr for Applicant Shawn Blackburn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14234691) by WSOU Investments LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr for Applicant Shawn Blackburn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14234691) by on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Arista Networks, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/25/2020) (am). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9,2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14222473). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet: Attorney Information)(Tribble, Max) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/25/2020) (am). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian W. Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Gregory Frenkel