This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:13:07 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendants

Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.

Huawei Technologies USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Jeffrey Huang

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group PLLC

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Law Firm of Walt Fair, PLLC

1508 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Travis Lee Richins

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120 / 324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brian Matthew Koide

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brett Aaron Mangrum

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Ryan Scott Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group PLLC

2600 E Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant Attorneys

G. Blake Thompson

Attorney at Mann, Tindel, Thompson

300 West Main

Henderson, TX 75652

Jason W. Cook

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Tyler T. VanHoutan

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Ste 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

J. Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel Thompson

300 W. Main St.

Henderson, TX 75652

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Mann, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Cook, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2020 (am). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W. Cook on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 10/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

2 #1

AO 120 Form

#2

(#2) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form) (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - US7460658

#1

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Mann, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Huawei Technologies USA Inc. answer due 1/5/2021. (am) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including January 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Cook, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2020 (am). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W. Cook on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (am) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 10/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 10/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocument Civil Cover Sheet was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are REQUIRED to be flattened upon filing. The US Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form) (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018507). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7460658, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Siegmund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Matthew Koide