This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:21:00 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development

WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendants

Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.

Huawei Technologies USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brett Aaron Mangrum

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Blvd., Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Ryan Scott Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group PLLC

2600 E Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Travis Lee Richins

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd., Suite 120 / 324

Southlake, TX 76092

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WSOU Investments LLC (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

2 #1

Ao 120 Form

#2

(#2) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 Ao 120 Form) (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - US6839321

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018505). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US6839321, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WSOU Investments LLC (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocument Civil Cover Sheet was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are REQUIRED to be flattened upon filing. The US Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 Ao 120 Form) (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018505). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US6839321, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2020) (am). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Etheridge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Scott Loveless