This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 10:06:44 (UTC).

Wriston v. West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Wriston filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas E. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00614

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas E. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janice Wriston

R. B.

Defendants

West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources

Child Protective Services

Joseph Sorrent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony M. Salvatore

Attorney at HEWITT & SALVATORE

204 North Court Street

Fayetteville, WV 25840

Greg A. Hewitt

Attorney at HEWITT & SALVATORE

204 North Court Street

Fayetteville, WV 25840

Defendant Attorneys

Jared C. Underwood

Attorney at PULLIN FOWLER FLANAGAN BROWN & POE

252 George Street

Beckley, WV 25801

Chip E. Williams

Attorney at PULLIN FOWLER FLANAGAN BROWN & POE

252 George Street

Beckley, WV 25801

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/23/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/7/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/14/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 12/21/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/28/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/4/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

#4

(#4) ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources.(Williams, Chip) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add jury demand) (ts).

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

2 #4

Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch

2 #3

Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson

2 #2

Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson

2 #1

Summons as Joseph Sorrent

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Child Protective Services, Joseph Sorrent and West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as Joseph Sorrent, #2 Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson, #3 Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson, #4 Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch) (mms)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch

1 #4

Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson

1 #3

Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson

1 #2

Proposed Summons as to Joseph Sorrent

1 #1

Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o Bill Crouch

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7740768. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o Bill Crouch, #2 Proposed Summons as to Joseph Sorrent, #3 Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson, #4 Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson, #5 Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/23/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/7/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/14/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 12/21/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/28/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/4/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources.(Williams, Chip) (Modified on 10/30/2020 to add jury demand) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Child Protective Services, Joseph Sorrent and West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as Joseph Sorrent, #2 Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson, #3 Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson, #4 Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch) (mms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7740768. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o Bill Crouch, #2 Proposed Summons as to Joseph Sorrent, #3 Proposed Summons as to Child Protective Services c/o April Robertson, #4 Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o April Robertson, #5 Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR c/o Bill Crouch, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

    Read MoreRead Less