This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 22:59:03 (UTC).

Wrist USA (Houston), Inc. et al v. M/V DILOS

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Wrist USA Houston , Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/V DILOS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03987

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wrist USA (Houston), Inc.

Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V.

Defendants

M/V DILOS in rem

M/V DILOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James D Bercaw

Attorney at King & Jurgens LLC

201 St Charles Ave, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorney

Dimitri P Georgantas

Attorney at Royston Rayzor Vickery Williams LLP

1600 Smith St, Ste 5000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M/V DILOS, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#11

(#11) Dilos II Special Maritime Enterprises' Verified Statement of Right or Interest and Entry of Restricted Appearance to Defend Vessel by M/V DILOS, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER for James D Bercaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service Executed as to Master or Officer on Watch, M/V DILOS IMO 9711535 on 12/9/2021 re: Maritime Arrest - Master, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service Executed as to Master or Officer on Watch, M/V DILOS on 12/9/2021 re: Maritime Arrest - Master, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION Permit Vessel Movement by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

3 #2

proposed Warrant for Arrest

3 #1

Proposed Order

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Verification of Counsel

1 #4

Exhibit D - Wrist-Klevenberg invoices

1 #3

Exhibit C - Wrist USA invoices

1 #2

Exhibit B - GTCs

1 #1

Exhibit A - Eletson Holdings Annual Report 2017

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27441978) filed by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eletson Holdings Annual Report 2017, #2 Exhibit B - GTCs, #3 Exhibit C - Wrist USA invoices, #4 Exhibit D - Wrist-Klevenberg invoices, #5 Verification of Counsel, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M/V DILOS, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Dilos II Special Maritime Enterprises' Verified Statement of Right or Interest and Entry of Restricted Appearance to Defend Vessel by M/V DILOS, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER for James D Bercaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service Executed as to Master or Officer on Watch, M/V DILOS IMO 9711535 on 12/9/2021 re: Maritime Arrest - Master, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service Executed as to Master or Officer on Watch, M/V DILOS on 12/9/2021 re: Maritime Arrest - Master, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketARREST WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon), filed.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Permit Vessel Movement by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 proposed Warrant for Arrest)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for James D. Bercaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2021. (Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27441978) filed by Wrist USA (Houston), Inc., Wrist-Klevenberg Ship Supply NL B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eletson Holdings Annual Report 2017, #2 Exhibit B - GTCs, #3 Exhibit C - Wrist USA invoices, #4 Exhibit D - Wrist-Klevenberg invoices, #5 Verification of Counsel, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dimitri P Georgantas