This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:42:47 (UTC).

WRIGHT v. YOUMANS et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 WRIGHT filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against YOUMANS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHERINE WRIGHT

Defendants

YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY

ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT ANDREW DIVIS

Po Box 1056

Macon, GA 31202

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN M WELSH

Po Box 1017

Macon, GA 31202

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Certificate of Service Certificat of Service

#19

(#19) STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificat of Service)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #17 Response to Motion, (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

17 #3

Exhibit Youmans Chevrolet Annual Registration

17 #2

Exhibit Defendants' response to Plaintiff's ante litem demand

17 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's ante litem demand

#17

(#17) RESPONSE filed by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #2 Exhibit Defendants' response to Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #3 Exhibit Youmans Chevrolet Annual Registration)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement

#12

(#12) MOTION to Set Aside Default by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY filed by STEPHEN M WELSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of George E. Youmans, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(WELSH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit O - Youmans Reply to FBPA Demand

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit N - Plaintiff's FBPA demand

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit M - CPO-related documents

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit L - Receipt for rear hatch service

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit K - Text Messages June 15, 2018

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J - Invoice for Water Damage Repair

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I - NOAA Rain Data

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Suburban Ads

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificat of Service)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #17 Response to Motion, (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE filed by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #2 Exhibit Defendants' response to Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #3 Exhibit Youmans Chevrolet Annual Registration)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 06/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Set Aside Default. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 05/29/2019. (chc) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (WELSH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Answer to Complaint filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement)(WELSH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Set Aside Default by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY filed by STEPHEN M WELSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of George E. Youmans, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(WELSH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Answer to Complaint filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, #10 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (vs) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (vs) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Certificate of Service Certificat of Service, motion for clerk's entry of default and affidavit in support of motion for clerk's entry of default)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to All Parties. (DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Reissued as to YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY. (ans) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KATHERINE WRIGHT (ans) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Youmans Chevrolet, #2 Summons Robins Financial Credit Union)(ans) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2019) (ans). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by KATHERINE WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Chevrolet CPO Website, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - GM CPO Webstie, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Suburban Ads, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - First Buyer's Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Gap Waiver, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Second Buyer's Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Receipt for Battery, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Text Messages May 31, 2018, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - NOAA Rain Data, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Invoice for Water Damage Repair, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Text Messages June 15, 2018, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Receipt for rear hatch service, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - CPO-related documents, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Plaintiff's FBPA demand, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Youmans Reply to FBPA Demand, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Summons Youmans Chevrolet Summons, #18 Summons Robins Financial Summons, #19 Summons George Youmans Summons)(DIVIS, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.