This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 09:39:52 (UTC).

Wright v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Wright filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark E. Ford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark E. Ford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linette V. Wright

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederick S. Spencer

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Spencer Law Building, 409 East Sixth Street

Mountain Home, AR 72653-3999

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Linette V. Wright. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 6, 2020. (cla) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 MAGISTRATE CONSENT)(lgd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Linette V. Wright. (Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Linette V. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Notice of Appeals Council Decision)(Spencer, Frederick) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Linette V. Wright. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.