This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:11:58 (UTC).

WRIGHT v. RASIER LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 WRIGHT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RASIER LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. Rodriguez and Ann Marie Donio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-13491

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD WRIGHT

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

RASIER LLC

RASIER CA LLC

JEAN CEZAIRE

3Rd Party Defendant

John A. Krewer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL THOMAS VAN DER VEEN

Attorney at VAN DER VEEN, O'NEILL, HARTSHORN & LEVIN

1219 Spruce St

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

ELIZABETH ANNE CHANG

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

900 Carnegie Boulevard West, Suite 100

Princeton, NJ 08540-6530

THOMAS M. KELLY

Attorney at FAUST, GOETZ,SCHENKER & BLEE

570 West Mount Pleasant Avenue

Livingston, NJ 07039

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 9/7/2021 11:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/30/2021. (rss, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JEAN CEZAIRE.(KELLY, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC. (CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC from Superior COurt of NJ - Camden, case number CAM-L-1655-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12618382), filed by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John A. Krewer, filed by JEAN CEZAIRE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(KELLY, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/7/2021 at 11:30 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, submitted via email at njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/12/2021. (slc) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 9/7/2021 11:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/30/2021. (rss, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JEAN CEZAIRE.(KELLY, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJudge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC. (CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC from Superior COurt of NJ - Camden, case number CAM-L-1655-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12618382), filed by RASIER CA LLC, RASIER LLC.(CHANG, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant