This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:19:41 (UTC).

Wright v. Montgomery et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Wright filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Montgomery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Nye and Robert J. Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David C. Nye

Robert J. Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jean M WRIGHT

Garden City, ID 83714

Jean Wright

Defendants

Mr Dennis Montgomery

Loretta J Montgomery

Jeannie Montgomery

Dennis Montgomery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Genther Mitchell

Attorney at William G. Mitchell, Attorney at Law

Po Box 140694

Garden City, ID 83714

Eric Robert Clark

Attorney at CLARK & ASSOCIATES, ATTORNEYS

Po Box 2504

Eagle, ID 83616

Defendant Attorneys

Trudy Hanson Fouser

Attorney at Gjording Fouser PLLC

121 N. 9Th St., Ste. 600, Pob 2837

Boise, ID 83701

Jeffrey Norris Street

Attorney at Gjording Fouser, PLLC

121 N. 9Th Street, Ste. 600

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dennis Montgomery, Jeannie Montgomery.(Street, Jeffrey)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #10 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (jd)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Norris Street on behalf of All Defendants (Street, Jeffrey)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Dennis Montgomery and Jeannie Montgomery. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Second APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Robert Clark appearing for Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Clark, Eric)

#3

(#3) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (jd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #3

Supplement Fee Waive rApplication

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jean M WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Fee Waive rApplication)(Mitchell, William)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dennis Montgomery, Jeannie Montgomery.(Street, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#12) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #10 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Norris Street on behalf of All Defendants (Street, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Dennis Montgomery and Jeannie Montgomery. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00263-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#5) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Second APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Robert Clark appearing for Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Clark, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (jd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jean M WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Fee Waive rApplication)(Mitchell, William)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.