This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 09:16:20 (UTC).

WRIGHT v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 WRIGHT filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04737

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRACIE WRIGHT

Defendants

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

TRANS UNION LLC

PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLORIA CHI-KI LAM

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

21 South 11Th Street, Ste 520

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MATTHEW FORSBERG

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Defendant Attorneys

BORIS BROWNSTEIN

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

210 Carnegie Center, Suite 102

Princeton, NJ 08540

DOROTHY A. KOWAL

Attorney at PRICE, MEESE, SHULMAN & D'ARMINIO, PC

50 Tice Boulevard

Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677

CHRISTOPHER ALBERT REESE

Attorney at STRADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 100

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Joint Discovery Plan by GRACIE WRIGHT.(FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Settlement reached with Trans Union LLC by GRACIE WRIGHT (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#23

(#23) LETTER ORDER granting Equifax's request for an extension of time until 10/17/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/16/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Settlement reached with Equifax Information Services LLC by GRACIE WRIGHT (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#21

(#21) Letter from Equifax Information Services, LLC Re: Extension of Time to File Answer w/ Plaintiff Counsels Consent. (BROWNSTEIN, BORIS) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#18

(#18) Order Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/1/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (REESE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(REESE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint Discovery Plan by GRACIE WRIGHT.(FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Settlement reached with Trans Union LLC by GRACIE WRIGHT (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LETTER ORDER granting Equifax's request for an extension of time until 10/17/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/16/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Settlement reached with Equifax Information Services LLC by GRACIE WRIGHT (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter from Equifax Information Services, LLC Re: Extension of Time to File Answer w/ Plaintiff Counsels Consent. (BROWNSTEIN, BORIS) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on September 27, 2022 at 11:30 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/7/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/1/2022. (dmr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (REESE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(REESE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DOROTHY A. KOWAL on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION extending time for Experian to respond to Complaint by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GRACIE WRIGHT. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GRACIE WRIGHT. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GRACIE WRIGHT. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GRACIE WRIGHT. TRANS UNION LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, TRANS UNION LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, ) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, TRANS UNION LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13585479) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GRACIE WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(FORSBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant