This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:09:47 (UTC).

Wright v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Wright filed an Other lawsuit against Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02636

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tress Wright

Defendants

Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.

Chris Daughtry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Odell Thickens

Attorney at Cavanaugh and Thickens LLC

1324 Gadsden Street, Po Box 2409

Columbia, SC 29201

James Eric Cavanaugh

Attorney at Cavanaugh and Thickens LLC

1324 Gadsden Street, Po Box 2409

Columbia, SC 29201

William H Yarborough, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Richardson Stuckey

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Timothy Michael McKissock

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Exhibit 2 - Opinion, Estate of Joseph Maglioli, et. al. v. Andover Subacute Reha

26 #1

Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, Jackson v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc.

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Tress Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, Jackson v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Opinion, Estate of Joseph Maglioli, et. al. v. Andover Subacute Rehabilitation Center I, et. al.)(Cavanaugh, James) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/2/2020) (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 9/2/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#23

(#23) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tress Wright. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cavanaugh, James) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#20

(#20) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/13/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/13/2021, Discovery due by 7/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2021, Motions due by 7/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/17/2021, Mediation Due by 9/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#19

(#19) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(Stuckey, Erin) Modified to edit text on 8/20/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#18

(#18) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(Stuckey, Erin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#10

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

9 #1

State Court Documents Acknowledgement

#9

(#9) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement)(McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#7

(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/19/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/14/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/13/2020, Discovery due by 1/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 4/26/2021, Motions due by 1/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/17/2021, Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chris Daughtry.(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02616 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9221729) filed by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc., Chris Daughtry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Tress Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, Jackson v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Opinion, Estate of Joseph Maglioli, et. al. v. Andover Subacute Rehabilitation Center I, et. al.)(Cavanaugh, James) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/2/2020) (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 9/2/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Reply due by 9/8/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/26/2020.(cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 22. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #23 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tress Wright. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cavanaugh, James) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/14/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/13/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/13/2021, Discovery due by 7/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2021, Motions due by 7/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/17/2021, Mediation Due by 9/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(Stuckey, Erin) Modified to edit text on 8/20/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(Stuckey, Erin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc. to 16 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 8/11/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/4/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tress Wright.(Cavanaugh, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 14, 2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tress Wright. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thickens, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgement)(McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 8/19/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/14/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/13/2020, Discovery due by 1/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 4/26/2021, Motions due by 1/27/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/12/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/17/2021, Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/16/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Chris Daughtry, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc..(McKissock, Timothy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chris Daughtry.(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc.(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-02616 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9221729) filed by Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Columbia, Inc., Chris Daughtry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less