This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:13:34 (UTC).

Wright v. DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Wright filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00717

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Wright

Defendant

DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michele D. Allen

Attorney at Allen & Associates

4250 Lancaster Pike, Suite 230

Wilmington, DE 19805

Caitlyn E. Quinn

Attorney at Allen & Associates

4250 Lancaster Pike, Suite 230

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendant Attorney

Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Notice of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Withdraw of Counsel by Robert Wright (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service)(Allen, Michele) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bianca N. Iozzia, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie J. Peet, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robert Wright: For DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Allen, Michele) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2624344) - filed by Robert Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Withdraw of Counsel by Robert Wright (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service)(Allen, Michele) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bianca N. Iozzia, Esq. filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie J. Peet, Esq. filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/19. (ntl) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bianca N. Iozzia, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie J. Peet, Esq. - filed by DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC. (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robert Wright: For DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Allen, Michele) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • No Summons Issued. (amf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against DuPont Specialty Products USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2624344) - filed by Robert Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less