This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2022 at 09:58:51 (UTC).

Wright v. Director, TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Wright filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Director, TDCJ-CID. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Campbell Barker and K. Nicole Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

Referral Judge

K. Nicole Mitchell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Randal W. Wright

New Boston, TX 75570

Respondent

Director, TDCJ-CID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Administrative Law Division

P O Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Letter

1 #2

Envelope(s)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randal W. Wright. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#3

(#3) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#5

(#5) DEFICIENCY ORDER. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either: (1) pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee, or (2) furnish a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account summary sheet. Petitioner need not submit another in forma pauperis application, but only the data sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/21/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Envelope(s)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Envelope(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-62203 (gsm) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Randall Wright (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s)) Docket sheet mailed showing non-payment.(jbe, ) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Sentence Reduction by Randal W. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, ) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENCY ORDER. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either: (1) pay the statutory $5.00 filing fee, or (2) furnish a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account summary sheet. Petitioner need not submit another in forma pauperis application, but only the data sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/21/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent form to Petitioner. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randal W. Wright. (wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Randal W. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(wea, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Larry Marshall