This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 07:42:29 (UTC).

Wright v. Bella Vista Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Wright filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Bella Vista Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy L. Brooks and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05016

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

Referral Judge

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy D. Wright

Bentonville, AR 72712

Defendants

John Doe Officer One

John Doe Officer Two

Bella Vista Police Department

Chief James Graves

Officer Anthony King

Officer Jeremiah Morris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

John L. Wilkerson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 38

North Little Rock, AR 72115

Jason B. Kelley

Attorney at City of Bella Vista

P.O. Box 5655

Bella Vista, AR 72714

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. Anthony King served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; Jeremiah Morris served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (lgd) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Kelley on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Jason) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jeremiah Morris, Anthony King and granting 21 days to answer, Jeremiah Morris and Anthony King substituted for John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 26, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two.(Wilkerson, John) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Wilkerson on behalf of Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two. (Wilkerson, John) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. James Graves served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Chief James Graves and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 1, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg) (tg). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Benton County ). (tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 28, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tracy D. Wright. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#2

No Description Available

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bella Vista Police Department, John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two, filed by Tracy D. Wright.(tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. Anthony King served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; Jeremiah Morris served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (lgd) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Kelley on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Jason) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthony King, Jeremiah Morris and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #11 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jeremiah Morris, Anthony King and granting 21 days to answer, Jeremiah Morris and Anthony King substituted for John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 26, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two.(Wilkerson, John) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Wilkerson on behalf of Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two. (Wilkerson, John) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. James Graves served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to James Graves and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Chief James Graves and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 1, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Benton County ). (tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 28, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tracy D. Wright. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg) (tg). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bella Vista Police Department, John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two, filed by Tracy D. Wright.(tg) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less