This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:39:36 (UTC).

Wright v. Albion, City of et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Wright filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Albion, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Gordon J. Quist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00516

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tommie Wright

Defendants

Scott Kipp

Tyler Collins

Albion, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory J. Rohl

Attorney at Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl PC

41850 W 11 Mile Rd., Ste. 110

Novi, MI 48375

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S. Bogren

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Kalamazoo)

950 Trade Centre Way, Ste. 310

Kalamazoo, MI 49002

Lauri Beth Stewart

Attorney at O'Connor DeGarzia Tamm & O'Connor PC

40701 Woodward Ave., Ste. 105

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Tommie Wright re #6 (Rohl, Gregory) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (ems). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Tommie Wright re #2 (Rohl, Gregory) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Tyler Collins (Stewart, Lauri) Modified text on 8/23/2019; this entry replaces #5 (ems). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Tyler Collins (Stewart, Lauri) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Lauri B. Stewart; attorney admission deadline set for 7/29/2019; (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Albion, City of, Scott Kipp (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #5

Attachment 4 - Proof of Service

1 #4

Attachment 3 - Notice of Filing Removal

1 #3

Attachment 2 - Complaint

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun County Circuit Court case number 19-1347-NO filed by Scott Kipp, Albion, City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment 1 - Summons, #3 Attachment 2 - Complaint, #4 Attachment 3 - Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Attachment 4 - Proof of Service) (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Tommie Wright re #6 (Rohl, Gregory) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (ems). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Tommie Wright re #2 (Rohl, Gregory) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Tyler Collins (Stewart, Lauri) Modified text on 8/23/2019; this entry replaces #5 (ems). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Tyler Collins (Stewart, Lauri) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lauri Beth Stewart on behalf of defendant Tyler Collins (Stewart, Lauri) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Lauri B. Stewart; attorney admission deadline set for 7/29/2019; (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #3 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Lauri B. Stewart (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Albion, City of, Scott Kipp (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Albion, City of, Scott Kipp in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4472720 (Bogren, Michael) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg). Modified filers on 7/1/2019 (ems). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun County Circuit Court case number 19-1347-NO filed by Scott Kipp, Albion, City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment 1 - Summons, #3 Attachment 2 - Complaint, #4 Attachment 3 - Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Attachment 4 - Proof of Service) (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.