This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:36 (UTC).

WRIGHT-RICHARDSON v. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 WRIGHT-RICHARDSON filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01980

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON

Defendant

EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard John Shea, Jr.

Attorney at SAWIN & SHEA, LLC

6100 North Keystone Ave., Suite 620

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Brian Walterman

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW, LLC

Po Box 631

Greenwood, IN 46142

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (HET) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC. served on 5/31/2019. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

1 #4

Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 25, 2019 TransUnion Cred

1 #6

Proposed Summons

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC., filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437088) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The December 13, 2018 Letter Sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 25, 2019 TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Brian Walterman on behalf of Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The December 13, 2018 Letter Sent by Plaintiff's Counsel

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC. served on 5/31/2019. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Brian Walterman on behalf of Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (HET) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC., filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437088) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The December 13, 2018 Letter Sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 25, 2019 TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.