This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 08:19:46 (UTC).

Wright Jr. v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Wright Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03957

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velo Wright Jr.

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelham Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Kaiser Permanente International

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi S.A.

GlaxoSmithKline plc

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Baum

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, P.C.

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Adam Michael Foster

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.C.

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei Goldman, P.C.

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Robert Brent Wisner

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei Goldman, PC

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Jennifer A. Moore

Attorney at Moore Law Group, PLLC

1473 South 4Th Street

Louisville, KY 40208

Pedram Esfandiary

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, P.C.

10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Thomas Bayman

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matthew J. Blaschke

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jessica Bodger Rydstrom

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Tommy Huynh

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sharon D. Mayo

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Jonathan S. Tam

Attorney at Dechert, LLP

One Bush Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Will W. Sachse

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Mark S. Cheffo

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#20

#19

#18

16 #2

Exhibit 2

#7

#6

#18

#17

#16

#15

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketTransferring case electronically to the Southern District of Florida. ***new case number 9:20-cv-81119*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) by MDL Panel on 7/7/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE ENTRY***ORDER STAYING CASES PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/30/2020. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) Modified on 6/30/2020 (tvnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER STAYING CASES PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION REGARDING TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelham Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelham Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blaschke, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Blaschke (Blaschke, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SHORTENED TIME; SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/23/2020. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Related Cases Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/19/2020) Modified on 6/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/19/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velo Wright Jr... (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to JPML, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to JPML filed by Boehringer Ingelham Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/17/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20061472. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14578824). Filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/17/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant