This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2020 at 09:26:16 (UTC).

Wright et al v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Wright filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02876

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Wright

Susan Wright

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Trans Union LLC

Bank of America NA

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Alexander Heeps

Attorney at Law Office of Jonathan A Heeps

Po Box 173472

Arlington, TX 76003

Matthew P Forsberg

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Defendant Attorneys

Maureen Margaret Gallagher

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Justin Kristopher Sauls, Sr.

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Forrest Mathew Seger, III

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2301 Broadway

San Antonio, TX 78215

Sarah Nichols Wariner

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2600 Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Frisco, TX 75034

Anna Olin Richardson

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#21

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

#18

#17

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

1 #33

Exhibit(s) FF

1 #26

Exhibit(s) Y

1 #23

Exhibit(s) V

1 #22

Exhibit(s) U

1 #21

Exhibit(s) T

1 #20

Exhibit(s) S

1 #3

Exhibit(s) B

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A

1 #1

Cover Sheet

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. The Court may at any time require local counsel to make an appearance on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/3/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel re 16 Order filed by Trans Union LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Gallagher, Maureen) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Maureen Margaret Gallagher added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Gallagher, Maureen) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendant, Trans Union LLC, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendant's pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/13/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Trans Union LLC answer or response due 11/3/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/13/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Justin Kristopher Sauls, Sr added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer or response due 11/27/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/13/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC ; served on 9/22/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Trans Union LLC ; served on 9/22/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 9/22/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bank of America NA ; served on 9/22/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 9/22/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Wright, Susan Wright. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Trans Union LLC. (mjr) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by James Wright, Susan Wright. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11181384) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Exhibit(s) L, #14 Exhibit(s) M, #15 Exhibit(s) N, #16 Exhibit(s) O, #17 Exhibit(s) P, #18 Exhibit(s) Q, #19 Exhibit(s) R, #20 Exhibit(s) S, #21 Exhibit(s) T, #22 Exhibit(s) U, #23 Exhibit(s) V, #24 Exhibit(s) W, #25 Exhibit(s) X, #26 Exhibit(s) Y, #27 Exhibit(s) Z, #28 Exhibit(s) AA, #29 Exhibit(s) BB, #30 Exhibit(s) CC, #31 Exhibit(s) DD, #32 Exhibit(s) EE, #33 Exhibit(s) FF, #34 Exhibit(s) GG, #35 Exhibit(s) HH, #36 Exhibit(s) II, #37 Exhibit(s) JJ, #38 Exhibit(s) KK, #39 Exhibit(s) LL) (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant