This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2020 at 07:44:47 (UTC).

Worsham v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Worsham filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CMRE Financial Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn, William J. Martinez and Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

Presiding Judges

Robert E. Blackburn

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy L. Worsham

Defendant

CMRE Financial Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorney

Erin Rayner Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/3/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#20

(#20) COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2020, ( Discovery due by 9/3/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

17 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendant CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tracy L. Worsham. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Erin Rayner Mangum added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by CMRE Financial Services, Inc..(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy L. Worsham. CMRE Financial Services, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/3/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/25/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/9/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00043-KMT. (athom, ) Modified on 1/8/2020 to correct text (athom, ). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mohammed Omar Badwan on behalf of Tracy L. WorshamAttorney Mohammed Omar Badwan added to party Tracy L. Worsham(pty:pla) (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of Tracy L. Worsham (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Erin Rayner Mangum added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by CMRE Financial Services, Inc..(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/3/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2020, ( Discovery due by 9/3/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Scheduling Conference. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. The parties shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendant CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tracy L. Worsham. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/ 28/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/28/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00043-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Erin Rayner Mangum added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) by CMRE Financial Services, Inc..(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Tracy L. Worsham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy L. Worsham. CMRE Financial Services, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/3/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/25/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/9/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00043-KMT. (athom, ) Modified on 1/8/2020 to correct text (athom, ). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mohammed Omar Badwan on behalf of Tracy L. WorshamAttorney Mohammed Omar Badwan added to party Tracy L. Worsham(pty:pla) (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of Tracy L. Worsham (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CMRE Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7080851)Attorney Joseph Scott Davidson added to party Tracy L. Worsham(pty:pla), filed by Tracy L. Worsham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Scott Davidson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mohammed Omar Badwan