This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2020 at 07:28:02 (UTC).

Worrell v. Learning Experience Systems LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Worrell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Learning Experience Systems LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey Kathleen Worrell

Defendants

Sanjay J Patel

Learning Experience Systems LLC

Siya Ram Investments LLC

Patel Unknown

Unknown Patel

Isha Patel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant Simeon Cragun

Attorney at Jackson White PC

40 N Center St., Ste. 200

Mesa, AZ 85201

Nathaniel James Hill

Attorney at Jackson White PC

40 N Center St., Ste. 200

Mesa, AZ 85201

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Morley

Attorney at Morley Mason PLC

4140 E Baseline Rd., Ste. 201

Mesa, AZ 85206

Benjamin Kendall Mason

Attorney at Morley Mason PLC

4140 E Baseline Rd., Ste. 201

Mesa, AZ 85206

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Kimberly Marie Shappley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Siya Ram Investments LLC. (MAW) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Learning Experience Systems LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Learning Experience Corporation f/k/a The Learning Experience Holding Corporation for Learning Experience Systems LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#15

(#15) Defendant The Learning Experience Systems LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Learning Experience Systems LLC.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sanjay J Patel, Unknown Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC.(Mason, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Kendall Mason on behalf of Sanjay J Patel, Unknown Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC. (Mason, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stacey Kathleen Worrell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Shawn Oller on behalf of Learning Experience Systems LLC. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon Isha Patel on 01/29/2020. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon The Learning Experience Systems, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company on 01/29/2020. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

6 #2

MIDP User Manual

6 #1

Notice - MIDP

#6

(#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 9, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17810181 filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Siya Ram Investments LLC. (MAW) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Learning Experience Systems LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Learning Experience Corporation f/k/a The Learning Experience Holding Corporation for Learning Experience Systems LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant The Learning Experience Systems LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Learning Experience Systems LLC.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sanjay J Patel, Unknown Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC.(Mason, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #10 ) and granting Defendants a one-time extension of time until March 6, 2020, to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's response to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/21/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Sanjay J Patel, Unknown Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Kendall Mason on behalf of Sanjay J Patel, Unknown Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC. (Mason, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stacey Kathleen Worrell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Shawn Oller on behalf of Learning Experience Systems LLC. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon Isha Patel on 01/29/2020. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon The Learning Experience Systems, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company on 01/29/2020. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 9, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Learning Experience Systems LLC, Sanjay J Patel, Siya Ram Investments LLC, Patel Unknown. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17810181. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-50-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Stacey Kathleen Worrell. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17810181 filed by Stacey Kathleen Worrell. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Learning Experience Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Marie Shappley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller