This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:09:25 (UTC).

Worley v. Clemons et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Worley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Clemons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Worley

Defendants

Jan Taube-Quispe

Michael Clemons

Coldwater, City of

Lewis Eastmead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at Excolo Law PLLC

1-800-Law-Firm, 26700 Lahser Rd., Ste. 400

Southfield, MI 48033

Madeline M. Sinkovich

Attorney at Excolo Law PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd., Ste. 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Defendant Attorneys

Audrey J. Forbush

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Flint)

111 E Court St., Ste. 1B

Flint, MI 48502

James E. Tamm

Attorney at O'Connor DeGarzia Tamm & O'Connor PC

40701 Woodward Ave., Ste. 105

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Richard Vaughn Stokan, Jr.

Attorney at O'Connor DeGarzia Tamm & O'Connor PC

40701 Woodward Ave., Ste. 105

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 7/12/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to complaint #1 Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Lewis Eastmead (Stokan, Richard) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Jan Taube-Quispe (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allen Worley as to Lewis Eastmead waiver sent on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendants Michael Clemons, City of Coldwater, and Jan Taube-Quispe to file responsive pleadings; deadline extended to 4/29/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for extension to file responsive pleadings by defendants Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Jan Taube-Quispe (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Lewis Eastmead, Jan Taube-Quispe (ns) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of Coldwater, Michael Clemons, Lewis Eastmead, Jan Taube-Quispe filed by Allen Worley (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Madeline M. Sinkovich on behalf of plaintiff Allen Worley (Sinkovich, Madeline) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 7/12/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to complaint #1 Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Lewis Eastmead (Stokan, Richard) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Richard Vaughn Stokan, Jr on behalf of defendant Lewis Eastmead (Stokan, Richard) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Jan Taube-Quispe (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Allen Worley as to Lewis Eastmead waiver sent on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James E. Tamm on behalf of defendant Lewis Eastmead (Tamm, James) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendants Michael Clemons, City of Coldwater, and Jan Taube-Quispe to file responsive pleadings; deadline extended to 4/29/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for extension to file responsive pleadings by defendants Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Jan Taube-Quispe (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Audrey J. Forbush on behalf of defendants Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Jan Taube-Quispe (Forbush, Audrey) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Michael Clemons, Coldwater, City of, Lewis Eastmead, Jan Taube-Quispe (ns) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Allen Worley in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390621 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of Coldwater, Michael Clemons, Lewis Eastmead, Jan Taube-Quispe filed by Allen Worley (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less