This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:15:14 (UTC).

Worldwide Film Productions, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Worldwide Film Productions, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10337

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Worldwide Film Productions, LLC

Defendants

John Torres

Ray Davido

JPMorgan Chase, N.A.

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark T Drooks

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg Rhow PC

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2561

Jeremy D Matz

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Linenberg and Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ashley D Bowman

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg and Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) DEFENDANT RAY DAVIDO'S WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. upon Ray Davido waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Peter W. Homer. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#23

(#23) DEFENDANT JOHN TORRES' WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. upon John Torres waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Glenn K. Vanzura. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (gk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#27

(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley D Bowman counsel for Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. Adding Ashley D. Bowman as counsel of record for Worldwide Film Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Attorney Ashley D Bowman added to party Worldwide Film Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Bowman, Ashley) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ray Davido. (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#28

(#28) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Ray Davido, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Torres amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC(Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#13

(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #13 served on 12/18/2019. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#22

(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John Torres. (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#24

(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #13 served on 12/18/2019. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#29

(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #27 , Amended Complaint/Petition #28 (Proof of Service of 1) Notice of Appearance of Ashley D. Bowman and 2) First Amended Complaint) served on January 15, 2020. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #27 , Amended Complaint/Petition #28 (Proof of Service of 1) Notice of Appearance of Ashley D. Bowman and 2) First Amended Complaint) served on January 15, 2020. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Ray Davido, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., John Torres amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC(Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley D Bowman counsel for Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. Adding Ashley D. Bowman as counsel of record for Worldwide Film Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Attorney Ashley D Bowman added to party Worldwide Film Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Bowman, Ashley) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DEFENDANT RAY DAVIDO'S WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. upon Ray Davido waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Peter W. Homer. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (gk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #13 served on 12/18/2019. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DEFENDANT JOHN TORRES' WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. upon John Torres waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Glenn K. Vanzura. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John Torres. (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ray Davido. (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Peter W. Homer. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC, (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24904226 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Worldwide Film Productions, LLC. (Attorney Mark T Drooks added to party Worldwide Film Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Drooks, Mark) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.