This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:25:14 (UTC).

Worlds Inc. v. Linden Research, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Worlds Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Linden Research, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01773

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Worlds Inc.

Defendants

Linden Research, Inc.

Linden Research, Inc. doing business as Linden Lab

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey B. Bove

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen R. Poppel

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Rex A. Donnelly, IV

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Aldo Noto

Wayne M. Helge

Alan A. Wright

Gregory A. Krauss

Defendant Attorneys

Tracey E. Timlin

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Michael J. Sacksteder

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-K

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Linden Research, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/12/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Linden Research, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Sacksteder for Linden Research, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Sacksteder of Fenwick & West LLP filed by Linden Research, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/18/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Sacksteder of Fenwick & West LLP - filed by Linden Research, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Linden Research, Inc. answer due 11/14/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/9/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2019 - filed by Linden Research, Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Aldo Noto for Worlds Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory A. Krauss for Worlds Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Alan A. Wright for Worlds Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wayne M. Helge, Alan A. Wright, Gregory A. Krauss, and Aldo Noto filed by Worlds Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/27/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wayne M. Helge, Alan A. Wright, Gregory A. Krauss, and Aldo Noto - filed by Worlds Inc.. (Bove, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Worlds Inc.. Linden Research, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bove, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Rex A. Donnelly, IV on behalf of Worlds Inc. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Linden Research, Inc. on 9/23/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Worlds Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,181,690 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Linden Research, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2736429.) - filed by Worlds Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Linden Research, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Worlds is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Sacksteder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracey E. Timlin